VA HB1663 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Buchanan. Shifts the town's municipal elections from May to November and reduces the number of council members from six to four. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Buchanan, Town of; amending charter, powers and elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 199 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1663ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103364D |