VA HB1663 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-20 - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-20 - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conditions for licensure of providers of mental health services. Provides that the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services shall not grant an initial license to a provider of mental health services other than a licensed hospital or a provider owned or operated by an agency of the Commonwealth if the provider is to be located within one-half mile of a public or private licensed day care center or a public or private K-12 school. The bill also provides that upon receiving notice of a proposal or application for licensure of a provider of mental health services, the Commissioner shall notify the local governing body and community services board of the locality in which the service is proposed to be established within 15 days of receiving such proposal or application, and that the local governing body and community services board shall submit comments on the proposal or application to the Commissioner within 30 days. The bill does not apply to applicants for a license to provide mental health services that have obtained a certificate of occupancy in accordance with the law and regulations in effect on June 30, 2011, or existing licensed providers proposing services within the same city or county in which they are currently providing services.
Title
Mental health services; conditions for licensure of providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-20 | House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100398D |