VA HB166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clerks of court. States that the clerk of an appellate court may request paper trial court records to be forwarded to such clerk. The bill adds the Bond Book to the list of books for which a microphotographic process may be used to accomplish the recording of writings otherwise required to be recorded in a book or retained in the clerk's office. In addition, the bill repeals an obsolete section of the Code that required circuit court clerks to keep a log of documents submitted for recordation that had not been recorded because they had not been acknowledged or proved.
Title
Court records; recording by microphotographic or electronic process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB166ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB166H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106690D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106690D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101344D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 258.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 341.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |