VA HB1646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; Board for Contractors; misclassification of worker prohibited. Provides that the Board for Contractors (the Board) shall require a contractor to appropriately classify all workers as employees or independent contractors, pursuant to law. Any contractor who is found to have intentionally misclassified any worker is subject to sanction by the Board.
Title
Contractors, Board for; misclassification of worker prohibited.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1646ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105545D |