VA HB1642 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; restrictive housing; data collection and reporting; report. Requires the Department of Corrections to report to the General Assembly and the Governor on or before October 1 of each year certain population statistics of persons incarcerated in state correctional institutions, including certain statistics regarding offenders placed in and released from restrictive housing and Shared Allied Management Units. This bill is identical to SB 1777.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictive housing; data collection and reporting, Department of Corrections to submit report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 453 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107695D-H3
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenators: Saslaw, Favola, Black
2019-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19HouseDelegates: Hope, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert
2019-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-18SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-18SenateSenate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106609D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1642S1
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106609D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106609D-S1
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H2
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19106306D-H2
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Militia, Police and Public Safety rejected 19105712D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106306D-H2
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105712D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-11-26HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2018-11-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100672D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53139.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1642
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1642ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0453+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0010+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0010+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0008+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0075+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2346+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0072+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1642+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0525HB1642+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2825+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0730HB1642+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1097HB1642+HB1642
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3323+HB1642

Bill Comments

feedback