VA HB1641 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Coal ash ponds; drinking water well; resident notification. Requires a utility, defined in the bill as the owner or operator of a coal ash pond, to complete a survey of all drinking water wells within 1.5 miles of each of its ponds by October 1, 2020, and to notify residents via mail and a local newspaper posting that the survey will be conducted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal ash ponds; definitions, drinking water well testing near ponds, resident notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1641H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106955D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106955D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 20104490D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011413.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback