VA HB1640 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health carriers; nurse practitioners. Requires health insurers and health services plan providers whose policies or contracts cover services that may be legally performed by licensed nurse practitioners to provide equal coverage for such services when rendered by a licensed nurse practitioner. The bill contains an enactment that exempts the measure from the requirement that the Health Insurance Reform Commission review any legislative measure containing a mandated health insurance benefit or provider. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health carriers; services provided by nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 332 (effective 10/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1640ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100868D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1640E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
2018-11-26HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-11-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100868D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823408(n/a)See Bill Text
3824221(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1640
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1640+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1640E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1640ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0332+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0051+HB1640
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0078+HB1640
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2345+HB1640
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0125+HB1640
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1640+HB1640
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1640+HB1640

Bill Comments

feedback