VA HB1639 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; correspondence of legislative aides exempt. Clarifies by defining "member of the General Assembly" that the working papers and correspondence of the legislative aides of members of the General Assembly are not subject to the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA when the aides are working on behalf of the member.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exempts correspondence of members of General Assembly & aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 199 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1639ER) |
2013-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 13102004D-E |
2013-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1639E |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102004D |