VA HB1637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Circuit court clerks; vendor fee for collection and delivery of filings. Permits a vendor to which a circuit court clerk has outsourced the processing of credit and debit card transactions for the payment of court fees to also collect and deliver to the clerk any filings for which it has processed a credit or debit card transaction for the payment of fees. The bill further permits the vendor to assess an additional fee for such collection and delivery.
Title
Circuit court clerks; vendor fee for collection and delivery of filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105509D |