VA HB1637 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restoration of parental rights. Creates a procedure for restoring parental rights to a parent whose rights to his child have previously been terminated when the child is at least 14 years of age and the child has not achieved his permanency goal. The bill also provides that the juvenile and domestic relations court may appoint a special advocate to provide services to a child who is the subject of judicial proceedings for the restoration of parental rights.
Title
Parental rights; procedure for restoring to parent whose rights to his child have been terminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1637ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100391D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1076 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)