VA HB1634 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shared solar programs. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish by regulation a shared solar program that allows customers of Dominion Virginia to purchase electric power through a subscription in a shared solar facility, which is defined in the bill as a facility that, among other criteria, generates electricity by means of a solar photovoltaic device with a nameplate capacity rating that does not exceed 5,000 kilowatts. Under the program, a subscriber receives a bill credit for the proportional output of a share solar facility attributable to that subscriber. Subscribers are required to pay a minimum bill, established by the Commission, that includes the costs of infrastructure and related services. The bill provides that the Commission shall approve a shared solar program of 150 megawatts with a minimum requirement of 30 percent of low-income customers and that the Commission will approve an additional 50 megawatts upon determining that at least 45 megawatts of the shared solar capacity have been subscribed to by low-income customers.
Title
Shared solar programs; electric utility regulation, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (68-Y 19-N) (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1238) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1238 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1634ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (68-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (68-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1634ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109890D-H2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Spruill, Obenshain |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Delegates: Jones, Mullin, Wilt |
2020-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20109064D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1634S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109064D-S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109064D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1634H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107909D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107909D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105598D |
Same As/Similar To
SB629 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1264)