VA HB1608 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. Creates the Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. The bill allows fiduciaries to manage digital property such as computer files, web domains, and virtual currency, and restricts a fiduciary's access to electronic communications such as email, text messages, and social media accounts unless the original user consented to such access in a will, trust, power of attorney, or other record. The bill repeals the Privacy Expectation Afterlife and Choices Act, which was enacted in 2015. This bill is identical to SB 903.
Title
Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 33 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017 | |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1608ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101621D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 1622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |