VA HB1604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care; reasonable efforts to prevent removal of child. Allows a local board of social services to take a child into immediate custody pursuant to an emergency removal order in cases in which the child is alleged to have been abused or neglected and allows a court to issue certain orders in such cases, without requiring that reasonable efforts be made to prevent removal of the child from his home if (i) the parental residual rights of the child's parent over a sibling were involuntarily terminated; (ii) the parent was convicted of murder or voluntary manslaughter, or a felony attempt, conspiracy, or solicitation to commit any such offense, if the victim was a child of or resided with the parent or was the other parent of the child; (iii) the parent was convicted of felony assault resulting in serious bodily injury or felony bodily wounding resulting in serious bodily injury or felony sexual assault, if the victim was a child of or resided with the parent; or (iv) on the basis of clear and convincing evidence, the parent has subjected any child to aggravated circumstances or abandoned a child under circumstances that would justify the termination of residual parental rights. The bill provides that, in each permanency planning hearing and in any hearing regarding the transition of the child from foster care to independent living, the court shall consult with the child, unless the court finds that such consultation is not in the best interests of the child. The bill makes other changes related to foster care to comply with federal requirements.
Title
Foster care; definitions, reasonable efforts to prevent removal of child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1604ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1604H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104379D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104379D-H1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101355D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 281 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 910.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |