VA HB1596 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; public works contracts; prevailing wage provisions. Prohibits state agencies from requiring bidders, offerors, contractors, or subcontractors to pay, or require the payment of, wages, salaries, benefits, or other remuneration to persons employed to perform services in connection with a public works project at a rate that is based on the wages and benefits prevailing for the corresponding classes of laborers and mechanics employed. A corresponding prohibition is made applicable to state agencies providing grants or other financial assistance for public works projects, unless otherwise required under federal law. The measure further states that it is the policy of the Commonwealth not to implement, adopt, enforce, or require any program, policy, or provision that requires a public works contract that requires the payment of wages or other remuneration at a rate based on the prevailing wage, whether modeled on the federal Davis-Bacon Act or similar state law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; public works contracts, prevailing wage provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1596ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N)
2017-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N)
2017-01-20HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-19HouseRead first time
2017-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
2017-01-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2017-01-11HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100238D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224321.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback