VA HB1595 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Vested rights; existing landscape cover materials. Provides that, notwithstanding any local ordinance to the contrary, an owner of real property who has an occupancy permit issued as of January 1, 2018, shall not be required to retrofit existing landscape cover materials. The bill further provides that such owner shall not be prohibited from continuing to use, supplement, or refurbish existing landscape cover materials at such property. This bill is identical to SB 972.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vested rights; owners of property not required to retrofit existing landscape cover materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 51-N) (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 51-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (42-Y 51-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1595ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1595H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106217D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106217D-H1
2018-02-09HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2018-01-29HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105605D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522307(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1595
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1595+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1595H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1595ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0702V0040+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0702V0050+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H07V0050+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0762+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S07V0074+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB1595+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0703HB1595+HB1595
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1663+HB1595

Bill Comments

feedback