VA HB1594 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Crime victims; immigration status. Provides that no law-enforcement officer or other agent of state or local government shall, when investigating a crime, inquire into the immigration status of any person who reports that he is the victim of the crime or the parent or guardian of a minor victim, or is a cooperating witness in the criminal investigation or the parent or guardian of a minor witness. The bill does not prohibit a law-enforcement officer from inquiring into the immigration status of a victim or witness who has been arrested or charged with a criminal violation, or when such inquiry is required by federal law or is essential to the investigation or prosecution of the crime to which the person is a witness or of which the person is a victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims and witnesses; immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105600D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19211.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback