VA HB1593 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sealing of order; court-ordered disclosure of electronic communication service records. Provides that when a court orders the disclosure of records of a provider of electronic communication services or remote computing services, the order and any written application or statement of facts may be sealed for 90 days for good cause shown upon application of the attorney for the Commonwealth in an ex parte proceeding and that the attorney for the Commonwealth can apply to have the sealing continue for additional 90-day periods.
Title
Court-ordered disclosure of electronic communication service records; sealing of order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392) | |
2011-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 392 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1593ER) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Printed as engrossed 11102298D-E | |
2011-01-24 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1593E | |
2011-01-24 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-06 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-06 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102298D |