VA HB1592 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; codes of student conduct; policies and procedures prohibiting bullying; parental notification. Requires each local school board to require the principal of each public school or his designee to notify the parent of any student who is involved in an alleged bullying incident of the alleged incident within 24 hours of learning of such allegation. Current law only requires the principal to notify any such parent of the status of any investigation into an alleged incident of bullying within five school days of when such allegation was made.
Title
Public schools; codes of student conduct, policies and procedures prohibiting bullying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 296 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1592ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 23106514D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1592S1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Amendment by Senator agreed to |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106514D-S1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106514D-S1 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 23103167D-E |
2023-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1592E |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103167D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
SB1072 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
SB1072 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)