VA HB158 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

House of Delegates and Senate district boundaries. Authorizes the General Assembly to make technical adjustments to legislative district boundaries subsequent to the decennial redistricting solely for the purpose of causing legislative district boundaries to coincide with local voting precinct boundaries. Any adjustment shall change districts only to the extent necessary to accomplish this purpose and shall be consistent with the criteria for districts established for the preceding decennial redistricting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House of Delegates and Senate districts; General Assembly authorized to make technical adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB158ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-30HouseRead first time
2018-01-26HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 10-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-21HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101899D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback