VA HB1578 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Students who receive home instruction; participation in interscholastic programs. Prohibits public schools from joining an organization governing interscholastic programs that does not deem eligible for participation a student who (i) receives home instruction; (ii) has demonstrated evidence of progress for two consecutive academic years; (iii) is in compliance with immunization requirements; (iv) is entitled to free tuition in a public school; (v) has not reached the age of 19 by August 1 of the current academic year; (vi) is an amateur who receives no compensation but participates solely for the educational, physical, mental, and social benefits of the activity; (vii) complies with all disciplinary rules and is subject to all codes of conduct applicable to all public high school athletes; and (viii) complies with all other rules governing awards, all-star games, maximum consecutive semesters of high school enrollment, parental consents, physical examinations, and transfers applicable to all high school athletes. The bill provides that no local school board is required to establish a policy to permit students who receive home instruction to participate in interscholastic programs. The bill permits reasonable fees to be charged to students who receive home instruction to cover the costs of participation in such interscholastic programs, including the costs of additional insurance, uniforms, and equipment. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2022.
Title
Students who receive home instruction; participation in interscholastic programs (Tebow Bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | (67 affirmative votes required to override) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (61-Y 39-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (61-Y 39-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed by until Wednesday, April 5, 2017 |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1578ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 38-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102346D |