VA HB1577 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tow truck drivers; criminal history. Authorizes the Department of Criminal Justice Services, at its discretion, to issue a tow truck driver registration to a person who was convicted of a violent crime or a crime involving the driving of a tow truck provided that such conviction occurred more than 15 years prior to the date of application and that all conditions of probation or parole related to such conviction have been satisfied. The bill does not change the existing prohibition on issuing a tow truck driver registration to a person required to register as a sex offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tow truck drivers; criminal history information, registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (76-Y 14-N) (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1237)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1237 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1577ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 4-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (76-Y 14-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (76-Y 14-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1577ER)
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateReported from Transportation (12-Y 2-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (79-Y 21-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseReported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 20104946D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462116(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1577&201+sum+HB1577
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1577+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1577ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1577ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1237+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1902V0039+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0077+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0801+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0102+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1388HB1577+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1471HB1577+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2046HB1577+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2044HB1577+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2007HB1577+HB1577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2182+HB1577

Bill Comments

feedback