VA HB1572 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; certain ROTC cadets. Provides that any enrolled cadet in good standing in any Reserve Officers Training Corps (ROTC) unit or any current member of a Reserve Component of the United States Armed Forces attending any public institution of higher education shall pay tuition in an amount no more than the institution's in-state tuition rate.
Title
ROTC cadets, certain; cadet attending any higher educational institution shall pay in-state tuition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100665D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1572 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1572+hil |