VA HB1562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Music therapy; licensure. Requires the Board of Social Work to adopt regulations establishing a regulatory structure to license music therapists in the Commonwealth and establishes an advisory board to assist the Board in this process. Under the bill, no person shall engage in the practice of music therapy or hold himself out or otherwise represent himself as a music therapist unless he is licensed by the Board.
Title
Music therapy; definition of music therapist, licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 103 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1562ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1562H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106167D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106167D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105438D |
Same As/Similar To
SB633 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3709.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3709.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |