VA HB156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; certain communication prohibited. Prohibits any person employed by or who has entered into a contract to provide services on behalf of the Department of Health or a local department of health from initiating communication regarding health-related matters with a minor on behalf of the Department or local department of health without the consent of the minor's parent, except as otherwise required by law.
Title
Health, Department of; certain communication prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102263D |