VA HB1555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; human trafficking awareness and prevention training required. Directs the governing board of each public institution of higher education to develop and implement policies requiring that a trauma-informed human trafficking awareness and prevention training program be provided to and completed by all first-year students as a part of such institution's first-year orientation program. The bill also directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to encourage private institutions of higher education to develop and implement policies to provide such a human trafficking awareness and prevention training program as a part of their first-year orientation programs.
Title
Higher educational institutions; human trafficking awareness and prevention training required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2023-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1555ER) |
2023-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102048D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1373 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
SB1373 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
SB1373 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Subjects
Higher Education
Human Trafficking
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Human Trafficking
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions