VA HB1550 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-7)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Grand larceny; threshold. Increases from $200 to $500 the threshold amount of money taken or value of goods or chattel taken at which the crime rises from petit larceny to grand larceny. The bill increases the threshold by the same amount for the classification of certain property crimes. This bill is identical to SB 105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand larceny; increases threshold amount.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1550ER)
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1550H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106976D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106976D-H1
2018-02-09HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-01HouseReferred from Rules by voice vote
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18100462D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182102(n/a)See Bill Text
182103(n/a)See Bill Text
182145.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182150(n/a)See Bill Text
182152.3(n/a)See Bill Text
182162(n/a)See Bill Text
182181(n/a)See Bill Text
182181.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182182(n/a)See Bill Text
182186(n/a)See Bill Text
182186.3(n/a)See Bill Text
182187.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182188(n/a)See Bill Text
182195(n/a)See Bill Text
182195.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182197(n/a)See Bill Text
18223(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.37(n/a)See Bill Text
18280(n/a)See Bill Text
18281(n/a)See Bill Text
18295(n/a)See Bill Text
18297(n/a)See Bill Text
192289(n/a)See Bill Text
192290(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.16(n/a)See Bill Text
291553(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1550
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1550+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1550H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1550ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0764+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0166+HB1550
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0118+HB1550
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0780+HB1550
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0381+HB1550
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1550+HB1550
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0923HB1550+HB1550

Bill Comments

feedback