VA HB1548 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advance directives; mental health treatment; capacity determinations. Provides that in cases in which a person has executed an advance directive granting an agent the authority to consent to the person's admission to a facility for mental health treatment and the advance directive so authorizes, the person's agent may exercise such authority after a determination that the person is incapable of making an informed decision regarding such admission has been made by (i) the attending physician, (ii) a psychiatrist or licensed clinical psychologist, (iii) a licensed psychiatric nurse practitioner, (iv) a licensed clinical social worker, or (v) a designee of the local community services board as defined in ยง 37.2-809. The bill also provides that a person's agent may make a health care decision over the protest of the person if, in addition to other factors, at the time the advance directive was made, a licensed physician, licensed clinical psychologist, licensed physician assistant, licensed nurse practitioner, licensed professional counselor, or licensed clinical social worker who is familiar with the person attested in writing that the person was capable of making an informed decision and understood the consequences of the provision. This bill is identical to SB 1511.
Title
Advance directives; admission of person for mental health treatment, capacity determinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1548ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1548H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17103796D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 17103796D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103471D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2983.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2986.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |