VA HB1544 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Credit Services Businesses Act; definitions; credit reports. Amends the definitions of "consumer reporting agency" and "credit services business" as they are used in the Virginia Credit Services Businesses Act and requires that the information statement provided to a consumer by a credit services business under the Act include a complete and accurate statement of a customer's right to receive a free copy of the consumer's credit report annually from each of the three nationwide consumer reporting agencies. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Credit Services Businesses Act; definitions, credit reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1544ER) |
2023-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-18 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101765D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 335.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 335.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |