VA HB1541 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Magistrates; appointment and supervision.
Title
Magistrates; appointment and supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Judicial |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105850D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 35.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 38 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 43 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 44 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 48.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |