VA HB1538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revision of Title 23; corrections. Corrects typographical errors and makes other technical amendments relating to the revision and recodification of Title 23 and declares such corrections and amendments to be effective retroactively to October 1, 2016. This bill is a recommendation of the Code Commission.
Title
Revision and recodification of Title 23; corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 314 (effective 10/1/16) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1538ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100873D-E |
2017-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1538E |
2017-01-18 | House | Speaker ruled floor amendment by Delegate Simon not germane |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-16 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100873D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 543 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1026 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2631 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 634 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |