VA HB1529 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; acceptance of terms and conditions associated with donations, gifts, and other private philanthropic support. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to establish a policy for the acceptance of terms and conditions associated with any donation, gift, or other private philanthropic support. The bill requires each such policy to include an administrative process for reviewing, accepting, and documenting terms and conditions associated with (i) gifts that direct academic decision-making and (ii) gifts of $1 million or more that impose a new obligation on the institution of higher education, excluding gifts for scholarships or other financial aid. The bill requires each public institution of higher education to retain documentation of such terms and conditions in compliance with the Virginia Public Records Act and provides that such documentation shall be subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Higher educational institutions, governing boards, donations, gifts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1529ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1529H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107594D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107594D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104445D |