VA HB1528 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Virginia Beach; vacancies in office of council member and mayor. Alters the process for filling vacancies in the office of council member and mayor in the City of Virginia Beach by replacing council appointments with special elections.
Title
Virginia Beach, City of; amending charter, vacancies in office of council member and mayor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101839D |