VA HB1523 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting entry onto school or other property; penalty. Expands the prohibition on entry onto school grounds by any adult convicted of a sexually violent offense to include (i) any school bus as defined in §46.2-100; (ii) any designated school bus stop during the time when school children are waiting to be picked up and transported to or are being dropped off from school or a school-sponsored activity or within 150 feet of the school bus stop; or (iii) any property, public or private, during hours when such property is being used solely by a public or private elementary or secondary school for a school-related or school-sponsored activity.
Title
Sex offenders; prohibiting entry onto school grounds or other property, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | House: Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-17 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2010-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100108D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1523 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1523+hil |