VA HB1522 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-20 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-20 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
Summary
Department of Business Assistance; Virginia Economic Development Partnership. Abolishes the Department of Business Assistance and transfers its duties to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership.
Title
Business Assistance, Department of; abolish & transfer duties to Economic Development Partnership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 44-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed (51-Y 44-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-05 | House: Referred from General Laws by voice vote | |
2008-01-24 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 082389592 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1522 |