VA HB1521 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (7-Y 14-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Kratom; prohibited acts; civil penalty. Provides that no person that sells, prepares, manufactures, distributes, or maintains kratom products, as defined in the bill, or advertises, represents, or holds itself out as selling, preparing, manufacturing, distributing, or maintaining kratom products shall prepare, distribute, sell, or expose for sale (i) any kratom product that includes or is packed with a substance that is not kratom and that affects the quality or strength of the kratom product or that contains any poisonous or otherwise deleterious ingredient; (ii) any kratom product that contains a level, as described in the bill, that is greater than two percent of the overall alkaloid composition of the product or any synthetic alkaloids or other synthetically derived compounds of the kratom plant; (iii) any kratom extract that contains levels of residual solvents that are higher than is allowed in Chapter 467 of current edition of the United States Pharmacopeia; or (iv) any kratom product that does not provide labeling directions necessary for safe and effective use by consumers, including a recommended serving size. The bill provides that any person that violates the provisions of the bill shall be subject to a civil penalty of $100 for a first violation, $200 for a second violation, and $500 for a third or subsequent violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kratom products; prohibited acts, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (7-Y 14-N) (Y: 7 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseFailed to report (defeated) in General Laws (7-Y 14-N)
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
2023-01-26HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-24HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100391D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413472.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413472.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5413472.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback