VA HB152 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Middle housing allowed on lots zoned for single-family use. Requires all localities to allow development or redevelopment of "middle housing" residential units upon each lot zoned for single-family residential use. Middle housing is defined as two-family residential units, including duplexes, townhouses, cottages, and any similar structure. Such structures shall not require a special use permit or be subjected to any other local requirements beyond those imposed upon other authorized residential uses. Localities may regulate the siting, design, and environmental standards of middle housing residential units, including setback requirements, provided that the regulations do not, individually or cumulatively, discourage the development of all two-family housing types permitted through unreasonable costs or delay.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Single-family residential use; middle housing allowed on lots zoned for units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-17HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2019-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-12-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104474D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522292.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback