VA HB151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Purse net fishing prohibited. Prohibits fishing for menhaden with purse nets (i) in the Chesapeake Bay and its tributaries within one mile of mean low water and (ii) within three miles of shoreline of Virginia Beach extending to the North Carolina border.
Title
Purse nets; prohibits fishing for menhaden in certain waters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101166D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB151 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB151+hil |