VA HB1505 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction. Clarifies that in any case involving the theft or misappropriation of the personal property of any member or employee of the General Assembly, the Capitol Police shall have concurrent jurisdiction with law-enforcement officers of any county contiguous to the City of Richmond. This bill is identical to SB 885.
Title
Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1505ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105079D |