VA HB1499 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; availability of absentee voting in person. Limits the availability of absentee voting in person to the two-week period immediately preceding an election. Under current law, absentee voting in person is available beginning on the forty-fifth day prior to an election.
Title
Absentee voting; limits availability of absentee voting in person.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Timothy Anderson [R] | Del. Ellen Campbell [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Del. Wendell Walker [R] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. Wren Williams [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100873D |