VA HB1488 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; standardization of public notice requirements for certain meetings, hearings, or intended actions. Standardizes the frequency with which and length of time in which notices of certain meetings, hearings, and other intended actions of localities must be published. The notice provisions included in the bill are organized into three groups: (i) publication required at least seven days before the meeting, hearing, or intended action; (ii) publication required twice, with the first notice appearing no more than 28 days before and the second notice appearing no less than seven days before the meeting, hearing, or intended action; and (iii) publication required three times, with the first notice appearing no more than 35 days before and the third notice appearing no less than seven days before the meeting, hearing, or intended action. The bill also standardizes descriptive information in such notices related to (a) proposing, amending, or repealing ordinances; (b) local budget adoption; and (c) zoning ordinances and planning-related actions.
Title
Local government; standardization of public notice requirements for certain meetings, hearings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1488ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107775D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1488S1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107775D-S1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107775D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105792D |
Same As/Similar To
HB443 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
SB413 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242)
SB413 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242)
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Local Government and Officials
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Local Government and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2108.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2108.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2271 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2316.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2652 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3242 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 3913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5156 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5431.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 749 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 7502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 907.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 958.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 958.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 723 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3245.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3245.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |