VA HB1487 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Housing and Community Development; forms and documents for landlords and tenants; translation into non-English languages. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development to translate all forms and documents that the Department is mandated by law to create and that are posted on its website for use by residential landlords and tenants into the five non-English languages most commonly spoken in Virginia. The bill allows the Department to accept materials translated by volunteers but requires the Department to verify the accuracy of such translations prior to making such translations available on its website. Department of Housing and Community Development; forms and documents for landlords and tenants; translation into non-English languages. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development to translate all forms and documents that the Department is mandated by law to create and that are posted on its website for use by residential landlords and tenants into the five non-English languages most commonly spoken in Virginia. The bill allows the Department to accept materials translated by volunteers but requires the Department to verify the accuracy of such translations prior to making such translations available on its website.
Title
DHCD; translation of certain forms and documents into five non-English languages on website, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] |
Del. Jackie Glass [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 332 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1487ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1487H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106368D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106368D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105783D |