VA HB1470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax deduction; union dues. Provides an income tax deduction beginning in taxable year 2024 for the amount paid by an individual for union dues for participation in a labor organization.
Title
Income tax, state; deduction for union dues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24100019D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1470 (Carry Over) 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
HB165 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
HB165 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance