VA HB1467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; obtaining certain identification documentation upon release. Requires the Department of Corrections and the sheriff, jail superintendent, or other jail administrator of a local correctional facility to provide the assistance necessary for any prisoner who does not already possess a government-issued identification card to apply for and obtain such identification. The requirement would apply for any prisoner who has been confined for a period of 90 days or more. If a prisoner is unable to obtain a government-issued identification, the Department would provide a Department of Corrections Offender Identification form. The bill further requires all costs and fees associated with obtaining such identification documentation to be paid by the prisoner unless the prisoner is determined to be indigent. Current law authorizes local correctional institutions to issue special identification cards prior to the release of any prisoner and requires the prisoner to pay all costs and fees associated with obtaining such card.
Title
Prisoners; obtaining certain identification documentation upon release.
Sponsors
Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 10-N) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 10-N) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1467ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20109297D-S2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1467S2 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Favola agreed to 20109297D-S2 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20108684D-S1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20109297D-S2 (Favola) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108684D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1467H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107239D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107239D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102753D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1093 (Same As) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 116.1:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 31.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |