VA HB1461 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Exemptions from milk production requirements. Exempts persons who own three or fewer milking cows from the oversight of the Milk Commission and the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services' requirements governing the quality, grading, and sanitary standards for milk so long as the milk their cows produce is sold directly to consumers and contains a label stating that the product has not been inspected by the state.
Title
Milk production; exemptions from certain requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2014-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100735D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1461 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1461+hil |