VA HB1460 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of private wells. Adds Stafford County to the list of counties and cities authorized to establish standards for the construction and abandonment of private wells that are more stringent than those standards adopted by the Board of Health.
Title
Private wells; Stafford County authorized to regulate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-12-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100713D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1460 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1460+hil |