VA HB1457 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Direct access to physical therapy. Provides that a physical therapist who has completed a doctor of physical therapy program approved by the Commission on Accreditation of Physical Therapy Education or who has obtained a certificate of authorization may evaluate and treat patients for up to 30 days after an initial evaluation without a referral if (i) the patient is not receiving care from a licensed health care provider for the symptoms giving rise to the presentation at the time of his presentation to the physical therapist for physical therapy services or (ii) the patient is receiving care from a licensed health care provider at the time of his presentation to the physical therapist for the symptoms giving rise to the presentation for physical therapy services and (a) the patient identifies a health care provider from whom he is currently receiving care, (b) the patient gives written consent for the physical therapist to release all personal health information and treatment records to the identified practitioner, and (c) the physical therapist notifies the identified practitioner no later than 14 days after treatment commences and provides the practitioner with a copy of the initial evaluation along with a copy of the patient history obtained by the physical therapist. The bill allows a physical therapist who has not completed a doctor of physical therapy program approved by the American Physical Therapy Association or received a certificate of authorization to conduct a one-time evaluation of a patient who has not met the criteria for evaluation and treatment without a referral and direction, provided the physical therapist does not provide treatment. The bill eliminates the requirement for continuing education for physical therapists who have received a certificate of authorization and eliminates the advisory committee established to consult with the Board of Physical Therapy in promulgating regulations for minimum education, training, and experience criteria.
Title
Direct access to physical therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1457ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1457ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100671D |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3482 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3482.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |