VA HB1441 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Taxation of all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road motorcycles. Provides that all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road vehicles shall be subject to the motor vehicle sales and use tax but exempt from the retail sales and use tax. Current law provides that such vehicles are subject to the retail sales and use tax but exempt from the motor vehicle sales and use tax. The motor vehicle sales and use tax would be imposed at the same rate as the state and local sales and use tax: at a rate of six percent in Planning Districts 8 and 23 and 5.3 percent in the rest of the state. The revenues collected from the motor vehicle sales tax on all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road vehicles would be distributed in the same manner as the state and local retail sales and use tax. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2018. This bill is identical to SB 249.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

All-terrain vehicles (ATVs), mopeds, and off-road motorcycles; taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 838 (effective 10/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1441ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 21-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (77-Y 21-N)
2018-03-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1441ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1441H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106096D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2018-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106096D-H1
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
2018-01-30HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 18103871D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812401(n/a)See Bill Text
5812402(n/a)See Bill Text
5812403(n/a)See Bill Text
5812425(n/a)See Bill Text
581602(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1441
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1441+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1441H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1441ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1441ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0838+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1001V0041+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0046+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0070+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0726+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0272+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB1441+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB1441+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1656+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB1441+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB1441+HB1441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1260HB1441+HB1441

Bill Comments

feedback