VA HB1430 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp extract; approval as food or ingredient; regulations; fund; emergency. Provides that an industrial hemp extract, as defined in the bill, is a food and is subject to applicable laws and regulations. The bill establishes (i) requirements for the production of an industrial hemp extract or a food containing an extract and (ii) conditions under which a manufacturer of such extract or food shall be considered an approved source. The bill authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations establishing contaminant tolerances, labeling requirements, and batch testing requirements, and it provides that moneys collected under the chapter shall be deposited in the Virginia Industrial Hemp Fund, created by the bill. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to report by November 1, 2020, a plan for the long-term sustainability of funding for the industrial hemp program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp extract; approval as food or ingredient, regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 4/6/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1430ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage Emergency (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1430H1
2020-02-03HouseEmergency clause added
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106371D-H1
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106371D-H1
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102804D

Same As/Similar To

SB918 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324121(n/a)See Bill Text
325145.1(n/a)See Bill Text
325145.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1430&201+sum+HB1430
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1430+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1430H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1430ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0659+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0101V0006+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0067+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0343+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0137+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0485+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB1430+HB1430
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1574HB1430+HB1430

Bill Comments

feedback