VA HB1430 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Right to Farm Act. Expands the definition of agricultural operations to include the commerce of farm-to-business and farm-to-consumer sales as well as commerce in other related items. The bill creates a rebuttable presumption that an agricultural operation is in compliance with local zoning ordinances when it operates on property that is zoned agricultural. The bill contains a clause providing that the provisions of the bill shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2014 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Right to Farm Act; expands definition of agricultural operations, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2013-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1430H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104491D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104491D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2012-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101109D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |