VA HB1426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; school meals; availability to students. Requires each school board to require each public elementary and secondary school in the local school division to participate in the federal National School Lunch Program and the federal School Breakfast Program administered by the U.S. Department of Agriculture and to make meals available pursuant to such programs to any student who requests such a meal, regardless of whether such student has the money to pay for the meal or owes money for meals previously provided, unless the student's parent has provided written permission to the school board to withhold such a meal from the student. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
School boards; availability of school meals to students, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 17-N) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 683 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1426ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (79-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102508D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1426E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102508D |